EP1119032 - A method for producing a semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/30] | A method and an apparatus for producing a semiconductor device | ||
[2007/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukada, Tsuyoshi 1-1870, Harukishiratsuchi, Togo-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 470-01 / JP | 02 /
Yoshino, Yoshimi, c/o Intellectual Prop. Dept. Denso Corp., 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Tanizawa, Yukihiko, c/oIntellectual Prop. Dept. Denso Corp., Showa-cho, Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2001/48] |
Former [2001/30] | 01 /
Fukada, Tsuyoshi 1-1870, Harukishiratsuchi, Togo-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken 470-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshino, Yoshimi 62, Kachibemae Inuyama-shi, Aichi-ken 484 / JP | |||
03 /
Tanizawa, Yukihiko 26-1, Jinai, Kamishigehara-cho Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken 472 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107622.1 | 20.04.1993 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP19920103091 | 22.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10309192 | JP19920135361 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: JP 13536192 | JP19920158331 | 17.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15833192 | JP19920161235 | 19.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16123592 | JP19920250162 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25016292 | JP19920250163 | 18.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25016392 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1119032 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1119032 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119032 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1119032 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3063, H01L21/78, G01P15/12, G01P15/08, G01L9/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B81C1/00888 (EP,US);
B81C1/00158 (EP,US);
G01L9/0055 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P15/123 (EP,US);
H01L21/3063 (EP,US);
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0235 (EP,US);
B81C2201/0114 (EP,US);
B81C2201/053 (EP,US);
Y10S148/028 (EP);
Y10S148/159 (EP);
Y10S438/977 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | H01L21/306 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Halbleitervorrichtung | [2007/49] | English: | A method for producing a semiconductor device | [2007/51] | French: | Méthode pour la production d'un dispositif semi-conducteur | [2007/14] |
Former [2001/30] | Ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen einer Halbleiteranordnung | ||
Former [2001/30] | A method and an apparatus for producing a semiconductor device | ||
Former [2001/30] | Méthode et un appareillage pour la production d'un dispositif semi-conducteur | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 09.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93106391.1 / EP0567075 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5095349 (FUJII TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0470003 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4706374 (MURAKAMI KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |