17.10.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
15.02.2008 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
16.11.2007 |
Change - English title |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
09.11.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
02.11.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.06.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2007 |
Change - English title |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
05.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.06.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
01.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
03.05.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.10.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] |
31.08.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] |
31.08.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] |
31.08.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] |
08.06.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
08.06.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
25.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|