Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | GB | | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | European patent granted | 12.12.2007 | Opposition procedure | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 25.07.2001 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 567075 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 25.07.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 25.07.2001 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20010327 | | Event date: | 17.10.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 17.10.2001 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | Free Format Text: | 7H 01L 21/3063 A, 7H 01L 21/78 B, 7G 01P 15/12 B, 7G 01P 15/08 B, 7G 01L 9/00 B | | Event date: | 28.11.2001 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FUKADA, TSUYOSHI | | Event date: | 28.11.2001 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | YOSHINO, YOSHIMI, C/O INTELLECTUAL PROP. DEPT. | | Event date: | 28.11.2001 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TANIZAWA, YUKIHIKO, C/OINTELLECTUAL PROP. DEPT. | | Event date: | 19.11.2003 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20031006 | | Event date: | 04.04.2007 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE		 | | Event date: | 30.05.2007 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE& X9;& X9; | | Event date: | 12.12.2007 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 0567075 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 12.12.2007 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 12.12.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 19.12.2007 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | | Event date: | 24.01.2008 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69334194 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20080124 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 01.08.2008 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 19.11.2008 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20080915 | | Event date: | 31.07.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20120425 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20120418 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.08.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20120504 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 23.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69334194 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 15.05.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20130419 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20130423 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20130419 | | Event date: | 25.10.2007 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 14.06.2007 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 09.11.2007 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 31.08.2001 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 08.06.2001 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 17.10.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 17.10.2008 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |