EP1176546 - Method for capturing the logical and spatial correspondance between object parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states millimeta GmbH Neckarstrasse 46 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states millimeta GmbH Alte Wacker Fabrik 64367 Mühltal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlenkhoff, Thomas Neckarstrasse 46 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | 02 /
von Tettau, Matthias Schleusenweg 11 60528 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/16] |
Former [2002/45] | Kewitz, Ansgar 2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen, Partnerschaft, Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | Köllner & Kewitz Patentanwälte Robert-Bosch-Strasse 7 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107681.7 | 28.03.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | DE2000137308 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10037308 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176546 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176546 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G06K19/06009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] |
Former [2003/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, um die logische Zusammengehörigkeit und den räumlichen Abstand von Objektteilen zu erfassen | [2002/05] | English: | Method for capturing the logical and spatial correspondance between object parts | [2002/05] | French: | Méthode pour détecter les correspondances logiques et spatiales entre les pièces d'un objet | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07275513 ; | [X]US5439221 (HARVIE IAN [GB]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 64 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE19807232 (SCHREINER ETIKETTEN [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 45 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6087612 (ROBITSCHKO PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 24 - line 56 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07275513 A 19951024 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |