EP1138784 - Method for determining the efficiency of nucleic acid amplifications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabiti, Karim, Dr. Gartenstrasse 26 C 82343 Poecking / DE | 02 /
Sagner, Gregor, Dr. Meichelbeckstrasse 16 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
Soong, Richie, Dr. 66 Gregory Street Parap, NT 0820 / AU | 04 /
Gutekunst, Martin, Dr. Escherstrasse 12 82390 Eberfing / DE | [2002/46] |
Former [2001/40] | 01 /
Tabiti, Karim, Dr. Gartenstrasse 26 C 82343 Poecking / DE | ||
02 /
Sagner, Gregor, Dr. Meichelbeckstrasse 16 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
03 /
Soong, Richie, Dr. Hotel Bergeist, Bahnhofstrasse, 47 82377 Penzberg / DE | |||
04 /
Gutekunst, Martin, Dr. Escherstrasse 12 82390 Eberfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107738.5 | 02.04.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | EP20000107036 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: EP 00107036 | DE2000134209 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10034209 | DE2000145521 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045521 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138784 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138784 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138784 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G06F19/00 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2527/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/40] | Title | German: | Methode zur Bestimmung der Effizienz von Nukleinsäureamplifizierungen | [2001/40] | English: | Method for determining the efficiency of nucleic acid amplifications | [2001/40] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination de l'efficacité des amplifications des acides nucléiques | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | IE | 02.04.2009 | LU | 02.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ISONO K, "[A novel quantitative PCR with fluorogenic probe]", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199703), Database accession no. NLM9086824, XP002232880 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - FUJII KUNIHIRO ET AL, "Mutation detection by TaqMan-allele specific amplification: Application to molecular diagnosis of glycogen storage disease type Ia and medium-chain acyl-CoA dehydrogenase deficiency.", HUMAN MUTATION, (2000), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1059-7794, pages 189 - 196, XP008014475 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-1004(200002)15:2<189::AID-HUMU8>3.0.CO;2-H | [X] - BOURINBAIAR ALDAR S ET AL, "Simple procedure for estimating the efficiency of PCR.", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 87 - 89, XP008013713 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02762328 | [ ] - RINSHO BYORI. THE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY. JAPAN MAR 1997, (199703), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0047-1860, pages 218 - 223 |