EP1148628 - Dimmer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Kopp AG Alzenauer Strasse 66-70 D-63796 Kahl / DE | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleckenstein, Hans-Jürgen Klosterweg 6 63776 Mömbris / DE | 02 /
Bendzinski, Peter Heidelberger Stasse 4 63110 Rodgau / DE | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01107807.8 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | DE20001017432 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017432 | [2001/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148628 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148628 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/257 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
H05B39/08 (EP,US);
H02M5/293 (EP);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H02M1/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/18] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dimmer | [2001/43] | English: | Dimmer | [2001/43] | French: | Gradateur | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 01.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4309048 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 61; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0106119 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4328528 (KOMPELIEN ARLON D) [X] 1,2,13 * column 5, line 16 - line 66; figure 1 * |