EP1184126 - Laser welding process of welding together overlapped plated steel sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/10] | Laser lamp welding process of welding together overlapped plated steel sheets | ||
[2008/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hidetaka Degawa, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Shoji, Kojima, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Tomotaka, Nagase, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 04 /
Hiroki Saito, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Kazuyuki Hosino, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 06 /
Satoshi, Ueda, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 07 /
Koji, Tomita, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 08 /
Kosuke Kawai, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 09 /
Hiroshi, Shimazaki, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
Hidetaka Degawa, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
02 /
Shiji, Kojima, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
03 /
Tomotaka, Nagasa, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
04 /
Hiroki Saito, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Kazuyuki Hosino, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
06 /
Satoshi, Ueda, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
07 /
Koji, Tomita, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
08 /
Kosuke Kawai, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
09 /
Hiroshi, Shimazaki, Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108157.7 | 30.03.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000094940 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000094940 | JP20000094941 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000094941 | JP20000094942 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000094942 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184126 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184126 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184126 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23K26/16, B23K26/24, B23K26/32, B23K33/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
B23K26/037 (EP,US);
B23K26/244 (EP,US);
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K33/004 (EP,US);
B23K2101/34 (EP,US);
B23K2103/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/18] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Laserschweissverfahren zum Zusammenschweissen von überlappten Stahlblechen | [2008/15] | English: | Laser welding process of welding together overlapped plated steel sheets | [2008/15] | French: | Procédé de soudage laser pour souder ensemble des tôles d'acier en recouvrement | [2008/15] |
Former [2002/10] | Laserlampeschweissverfahren zum Zusammenschweissen von überlappten Stahlblechen | ||
Former [2002/10] | Laser lamp welding process of welding together overlapped plated steel sheets | ||
Former [2002/10] | Procédé de soudage à lampe laser pour souder ensemble des tôles d'acier en recouvrement | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08161418.2 / EP1982789 | EP08161454.7 / EP1985402 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.09.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GB | 30.03.2009 | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/09] | NL | 10.09.2008 | |
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | NL | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH11226765 ; | [X]US4916284 (PETRICK FREDERICK D [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 2; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5104032 (SPIES BERARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11226765 A 19990824 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [AD] 1-4 * abstract * |