EP1247568 - Microcapsules (XIII) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primacare S.L., c/o Cognis Iberica S.L. Sector E, c/No. 42, Zona Franca 08040 Barcelona / ES | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viladot Petit, Josep-Lluis Rbla/Poblenou 133,2 3a 08018 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
De Moragas, Maria C/Sant Narcis, 28, Bajos 08310 Argentona (Barcelona) / ES | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Fabry, Bernd, Dr. c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108374.8 | 03.04.2001 | [2002/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247568 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, B01J13/10, B01J13/20 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
D06M23/12 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
B01J13/02 (EP);
B01J13/10 (EP);
B01J13/20 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Mikrokapseln (XIII) | [2002/41] | English: | Microcapsules (XIII) | [2002/41] | French: | Microcapsules (XIII) | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 10.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5855826 (LEE CHUNG NAM [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5985354 (MATHIOWITZ EDITH [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 65 *; | [A]EP0970623 (K D PHARMA BEXBACH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |