EP1148039 - A process for the production of CHF3 (HFC-23) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states AGORA' S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Ausimont S.p.A. Piazzetta Maurilio Bossi 3 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuzzato, Paolo Vicolo Mazzini 7 31050 Ponzano Veneto, Treviso / IT | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01108597.4 | 05.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI00903 | 21.04.2000 Original published format: IT MI000903 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148039 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/37, C07C19/08 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
C07C17/37 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/37, C07C19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/29] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von CHF3 (HFC-23) | [2001/43] | English: | A process for the production of CHF3 (HFC-23) | [2001/43] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de CHF3 (HFC-23) | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2676996 (MILLER CHARLES B, et al) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 38 - line 43; claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]US3087976 (MURRAY HAUPTSCHEIN, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 30 - line 35; claim - *; | [X]US3651156 (SCHERER OTTO, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4069266 (KOMATSU TADAAKI, et al) [X] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 39 - line 51; claims 1-3 *; | JPS5653290B [ ] (CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., JAPAN); | [A]WO9202476 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0537759 (AUSIMONT SRL [IT]) [DA] 4,5 * page 2, line 29 - line 42 *; | [A]EP0569832 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5-7 * page 2, line 46 - line 55 *; | [PA]EP1052235 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [PA] 1,5-7 * the whole document *; | [X] - CENTRAL GLASS CO., LTD., JAPAN, "Trifluoromethane", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19820510), vol. 96, no. 19, Database accession no. 162110, XP002171569 [X] 1 * abstract * |