EP1146217 - Circuit arrangement for operating an electromagnetic lift armature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellermann, Helmut, Dr. Bernd-Isemann-Weg 9 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [2001/42] | Application number, filing date | 01108705.3 | 06.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | DE2000118175 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018175 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146217 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1146217 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20, F01L9/04 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP);
F01L9/20 (EP);
F02D13/0253 (EP);
F02D2041/001 (EP);
F02D2041/2017 (EP);
F02D2041/2072 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | F02D41/20 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/50] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb eines hochdynamischen elektromagnetischen Hubanker-Aktors | [2001/42] | English: | Circuit arrangement for operating an electromagnetic lift armature | [2001/42] | French: | Circuit pour actionner une armature de levée électromagnétique | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09189209 ; | [A]JPH1047140 ; | [XY]EP0727566 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 24 * * column 14, line 34 - column 15, line 47 * * column 18, line 22 - line 54 * * figures 8,11 * [Y] 6; | [XY]DE19747033 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 6 - line 58 * * figure 2 * [Y] 6; | [X]WO9930068 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column A *; | EP1036964 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0040] ** figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09189209 A 19970722 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10047140 A 19980217 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-4,6 * abstract * * figure - * |