EP1146301 - Process and apparatus for the production of high pressure nitrogen from air separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Linde Gas Aktiengesellschaft Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voit, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Mühlaustrasse 18 86938 Schondorf / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Imhof, Dietmar Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108734.3 | 06.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | DE20001018200 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018200 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146301 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
F25J3/04321 (EP);
F25J3/04084 (EP);
F25J3/04284 (EP);
F25J3/04412 (EP);
F25J2200/20 (EP);
F25J2200/54 (EP);
F25J2245/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Drückstickstoff durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft | [2001/42] | English: | Process and apparatus for the production of high pressure nitrogen from air separation | [2001/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de production d'azote à haute pression par séparation d'air | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 05.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 11.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0924486 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 8, line 37 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]US5303556 (DRAY JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [PA]DE10013073 (LINDE AG [DE]) [PA] 1-5 * column 4, line 61 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9819122 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-5 * page 6, line 1 - line 8; figure 1 * |