EP1149741 - Folding method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleeberger, Peter Claude-Lorrain-Strasse 37 81543 München / DE | 02 /
Strasser, Christian L. Caecilienstrasse 22 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108761.6 | 06.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | DE20001020677 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10020677 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149741 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1149741 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149741 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, B60R21/20 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B60R21/237 (EP,US);
B60R21/201 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2375 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2617 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Faltverfahren und -vorrichtung | [2001/44] | English: | Folding method and device | [2001/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de pliage | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 22.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9101099U (AUTOLIV-KOLB GMBH & CO, 8060 DACHAU, DE) [X] 1,3,4,7,12-15 * page 3, line 13 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2309942 (AIRBAGS INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4,11,13-16 * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 26; figures 5,6 *; | [X]EP0888226 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,12-16 * page 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 2a,2b *; | [PA]DE19856623 (IMECO EINWEGPRODUKTE GMBH & CO [DE]) [PA] 3,15,16* the whole document *; | [PX]WO0068040 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [PX] 1,12,13 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 9; figures 6,7 * |