14.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |
30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
23.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
21.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
29.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
20.06.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.07.2007 |
First examination report |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.12.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.08.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
09.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
16.11.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
31.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] |