EP1145865 - Coating liquid, image recording method and recording using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2008/30] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Fumitsugu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Yatake, Masahiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Komatsu, Hidehiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
Ota, Hitoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 05 /
Hara, Kazuhiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01108936.4 | 10.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | JP20000108356 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000108356 | JP20000326069 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000326069 | JP20000326076 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000326076 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145865 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1145865 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145865 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, C09D11/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B41M7/0027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/42] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsflüssigkeit, Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren und eine damit erzeugte Aufzeichnung | [2001/42] | English: | Coating liquid, image recording method and recording using the same | [2001/42] | French: | Liquide de revêtement, méthode d'enregistrement d'image et enregistrement à partir de celui-ci | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PT | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | IE | 10.04.2009 | LU | 10.04.2009 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2009 | ||
LU | 10.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2009 | ||
LU | 10.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 23.07.2008 | |
ES | 03.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0322755 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 7 * * page 19; table . *; | [Y]EP0751009 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * page 5, line 45 * * page 10, line 12 - line 18; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0753552 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [Y] 6,12,34,37 * page 2, line 5 - line 6 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, line 8 - line 19 * * page 8, line 14 * * page 17, line 1 - line 14 * * page 19, line 1 - line 13; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5746814 (MALHOTRA SHADI L [CA], et al) [Y] 4,10 * column 1, line 13 - line 20 * * column 5, line 38 - line 40 * * column 7, line 31 - line 44 *; | [Y]EP0842994 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 27,30 * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 1 * * page 6, line 30 - line 52; claims 1-3 *; | [D]JPH10195360 (CANON KK); | [Y]EP0978547 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 13-19,26,28,29,38-44 * page 2, line 7 - line 18 * * page 2, line 53 - page 4, line 31 * * page 4, line 45 - page 5, line 49 * * page 7, line 45 - line 47 * * page 25, line 21 - line 37; claims 1,18,19 *; | [XY]WO0006390 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,11,20-25,31-33,35,36,45 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 5 * * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 8 * * page 22, line 18 - page 24, line 12 * * page 25, line 13 - page 26, line 11 * * page 28, line 9 - page 29, line 23; claim 1 * [Y] 2,4,6,10,12-19,26-30,34,37-44 | by applicant | JPS59104974 | JPS62101482 | JPH01141782 | JPH0280279 | JPH06115066 | JPH09262971 | JPH10195360 | JPH10330665 |