EP1152634 - Interconnecting equipment between an ISDN subscriber installation and an IP/ATM network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92848 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS 250, Route de l'Empereur 92848 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Sagem Communications Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states SAGEM Communication Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Safran 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states SAGEM S.A. 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campagnac, Isabelle 12 bis rue Jean Roger Therelle 92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | 02 /
Bayle, Monique 2 allée des Droits de l'Homme 78114 Magny Les Hameaux / FR | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Lapoux, Roland, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Lapoux, Roland, et al Cabinet BLOCH & GEVERS 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/45] | Lapoux, Roland M. Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux, 43 Boulevard Vauban, B.P. 405, Guyancourt 78055 Saint Quentin Yvelines Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01109268.1 | 14.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | FR20000005680 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0005680 | [2001/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152634 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152634 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0457 (EP);
H04Q3/0025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | H04Q11/04, H04Q3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2002/40] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsanlage zwischen einer ISDN Teilnehmereinrichtung und einem IP/ATM Netzwerk | [2001/45] | English: | Interconnecting equipment between an ISDN subscriber installation and an IP/ATM network | [2001/45] | French: | Equipement d'interconnexion entre une installation d'usager RNIS et un réseau IP/ATM | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0991293 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * [A] 4-10 [Y] 3; | [Y]GB2309362 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 12 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 3 *; | [A]WO0024210 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - SINGER J ET AL, "NARROWBAND SERVICES OVER ATM NETWORKS: EVALUATION OF TRUNKING METHODS", ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM),CA,TORONTO, PINNACLE GROUP, (19970921), pages 17 - 25, XP000704451 [A] 1 * the whole document * |