EP1147881 - Method for the manufacture of a self-adhesive label [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACHEM Papier - Chem. Produktions Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG Riedstrasse 2 6845 Hohenems / AT | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Summer, Thomas Bruderhof 18 6833 Klaus / AT | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Hefel, Herbert, et al Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 01109288.9 | 17.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | AT20000000705 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: AT 7052000 | [2001/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1147881 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1147881 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B31D1/02, B32B31/12 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
B31D1/021 (EP);
B32B37/1284 (EP);
B32B2310/0831 (EP);
B32B2519/00 (EP);
B32B37/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/43] | Extension states | SI | 29.10.2002 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines selbstklebenden Etikettes | [2001/43] | English: | Method for the manufacture of a self-adhesive label | [2001/43] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une étiquette auto-adhésive | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/22] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9955517 (SANCOA INTERNATIONAL COMPANY L [US]) [X] 1-10 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [X]US5676785 (SAMONIDES JOHN [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 34 * * column 6, line 9 - line 47 *; | [A]US5201976 (EASTIN DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 42 *; | [A]US4253899 (TAKEMOTO SHIRO G, et al) [A] 1-7,10 * column 1, line 15 - line 32 * * column 2, line 5 - line 49 * * column 3, line 9 - line 30 * * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 48 *; | [A]US5284688 (HIATT NORMAN A [US]) [A] 1-5,7,10 * column 1, line 9 - line 35 * * column 2, line 15 - line 39 *; | [A]US4022926 (KEOUGH ALLEN H, et al) [A] 1-3,7,10 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [A]DE3403364 (SCHAEFER ETIKETTEN [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,10 * Das ganze Dokument * |