EP1158534 - Semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akaogi, Takao Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Takashina, Nobuaki Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kasa, Yasushi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Itano, Kiyoshi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Kawashima, Hiromi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Yamashita, Minoru Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Kawamura, Shouichi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01109454.7 | 25.06.1993 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930000304 | 05.01.1993 Original published format: JP 30493 | JP19920324284 | 03.12.1992 Original published format: JP 32428492 | JP19920349481 | 28.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34948192 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1158534 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1158534 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158534 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/30, G11C16/12 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
G11C29/80 (EP,US);
G11C29/00 (KR);
G11C16/06 (KR);
G11C16/08 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/107 (EP,US);
G11C16/12 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
G11C16/3404 (EP,US);
G11C16/3409 (EP,US);
G11C16/3436 (EP,US);
G11C16/3445 (EP,US);
G11C16/3459 (EP,US);
G11C16/3472 (EP,US);
G11C16/3481 (EP,US);
G11C29/028 (EP,US);
G11C29/34 (EP,US);
G11C29/46 (EP,US);
G11C29/50 (EP,US);
G11C29/50004 (EP,US);
G11C29/802 (EP,US);
G11C29/82 (EP,US);
G11C5/145 (EP,US);
G11C7/067 (EP,US);
G11C8/00 (EP,US);
G11C8/08 (EP,US);
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | G11C16/12, G11C16/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [2001/48] | English: | Semiconductor memory device | [2001/48] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93110192.7 / EP0600151 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9205559 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 5-7,9-13 [A] 1-4; | EP0549795 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [ ] * page 8, line 5 - line 13 * * page 8, line 20 - line 26 * * page 8, line 39 - line 44; figure 1 * * page 11, line 21 - line 23; figure 9 * * page 13, line 52 - page 14, line 12; figures 21A-21B *; | [A]EP0376065 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 31 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2667169 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 3,9 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 8; figure 2 * |