EP1152614 - Digital over-the-air entertainment and information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sibley, Erin 4330 Monteith Drive Los Angeles, CA 90043 / US | 02 /
Goliff, William 984 South Ynez Avenue Monterey Park, CA 91754 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Michael, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109501.5 | 14.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | US20000564082 | 03.05.2000 Original published format: US 564082 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152614 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/6181 (US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/6193 (US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitale Unterhaltung via Funk und Information | [2001/45] | English: | Digital over-the-air entertainment and information | [2001/45] | French: | Divertissement digital par voie hertzienne et information | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |