EP1148614 - Battery operated power circuit and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20 Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20 Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ootani, Mitsuaki 16-20, Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109542.9 | 17.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | JP20000115045 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000115045 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148614 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148614 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02M3/158 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
H02M3/06 (KR);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/16] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Batteriebetriebene Leistungsschaltung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2001/43] | English: | Battery operated power circuit and driving method thereof | [2001/43] | French: | Circuit de puissance alimenté par batterie et méthode de commande de cêlui-ci | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5422562 (MAMMANO ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * figures 2,5 * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 4 *; | [X]US5963439 (WUIDART LUC [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 11 - line 25 *; | [X]US5998977 (HSU JEAN F Y [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 4, line 10 - line 30 *; | [X]US5877611 (BRKOVIC MILIVOJE SLOBODAN [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2287843 (K B ELECTRONICS [CA]) [X] 1 * figure 2A * * page 19, line 11 - line 13 *; | [X]EP0945968 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 * |