EP1149678 - Method of making a safety support for tyre and safety support so produced [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bon, Bernard 6 rue de la Commanderie 63200 Yssac-la-Tourette / FR | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Hiebel, Robert Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Hiebel, Robert Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01109551.0 | 18.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | FR20000005346 | 25.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0005346 | [2001/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149678 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149678 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/08, B60C17/06, C08J9/12 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
C08J9/102 (EP,US);
B29C44/08 (EP,US);
B60C17/06 (EP,US);
B60C17/065 (EP,US);
C08J2309/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Notlaufrings für einen Reifen, und derart hergestellter Notlaufring | [2003/20] | English: | Method of making a safety support for tyre and safety support so produced | [2001/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un appui de sécurité pour pneumatique et appui obtenu par ce procédé | [2001/44] |
Former [2001/44] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Notlaufrings für einen Reifen und Notlaufring so Hergestellt | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03005217.9 / EP1323771 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2004 | CY | 18.02.2004 | ES | 18.02.2004 | FI | 18.02.2004 | IE | 18.02.2004 | NL | 18.02.2004 | TR | 18.02.2004 | BE | 30.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | DK | 18.05.2004 | GR | 18.05.2004 | SE | 18.05.2004 | PT | 18.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
CY | 18.02.2004 | ||
ES | 18.02.2004 | ||
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
NL | 18.02.2004 | ||
TR | 18.02.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
NL | 18.02.2004 | ||
TR | 18.02.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
NL | 18.02.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
NL | 18.02.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 18.02.2004 | |
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 18.02.2004 | |
SE | 18.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06183226 ; | [A]JPS5975912 ; | [DA]GB2013143 (UNIROYAL INC) [DA] 1,6,9 * page 3, line 46 - line 58 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 31, Database accession no. 1994-252425, XP002156731 & JPH06183226 A 19940705 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1,6,9,12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 23, Database accession no. 1984-143561, XP002156732 & JPS5975912 A 19840428 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |