EP1148034 - Final blow/finish cooling valve function monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. One Sea Gate Toledo, Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wacke, Robert S. 2251 Scottwood Avenue Toledo, OH 43620 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Zwirner, Gottfried Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zwirner, Gottfried Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Zwirner, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-W.-Ing. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109574.2 | 18.04.2001 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US20000552365 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: US 552365 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1148034 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1148034 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148034 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/36, C03B9/38, C03B9/41 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
C03B9/385 (EP,US);
C03B9/3627 (EP,US);
C03B9/3654 (EP,US);
C03B9/3672 (EP,US);
C03B9/3816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/43] | Title | German: | Ventilüberwachung der Blasluft und Behälterhals-Kühlluft | [2004/35] | English: | Final blow/finish cooling valve function monitor | [2001/43] | French: | Moniteur pour vanne de soufflage/refroidissement du cou de recipient | [2004/35] |
Former [2001/43] | Ventilfunktionsmonitor zum Endblasen/Endkühlen | ||
Former [2001/43] | Moniteur pour vanne de soufflage/refroidissement finisseur | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 26.01.2005 | CY | 18.04.2005 | LU | 18.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/26] | TR | 26.01.2005 | |
CY | 18.04.2005 | ||
LU | 18.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | TR | 26.01.2005 | |
CY | 18.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | TR | 26.01.2005 | |
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | TR | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3236620 (WILEY ROBERT F) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]US3281230 (LYON KENNETH C, et al) [A] 1,11* column W *; | [X]US3407055 (ARGYLE LEROY C, et al) [X] 1,7 * column W * |