EP1151939 - Device for wrapping and transporting a liquid container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ziegleder-Weiss, Agnes Watzenberg 4 84384 Wittibreut / DE | [2001/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109585.8 | 18.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | DE20001021300 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10021300 | [2001/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1151939 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1151939 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1151939 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, B65D23/08 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B65D77/0406 (EP);
B65D81/3897 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen und Transportieren eines Flüssigkeitsbehälters | [2001/45] | English: | Device for wrapping and transporting a liquid container | [2001/45] | French: | Dispositif pour envelopper et transporter un récipient de liquide | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | IE | 18.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/20] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1939777 (HUMBOLDT AUGUST L) [X] 1-3 * page 1, column L, line 48 - column R, line 101; figure - * [A] 4-8; | [A]GB2221292 (HUSSAIN VICTOR) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US5005374 (SPITLER MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 7,8* column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 2; figure 11 *; | [XY]DE9103779U (LAURER THERESIA) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 32; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-8; | [Y]EP0710608 (ORIA SEEFF [IL]) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 15 - line 18; figures 15A-16B *; | [A]US5555746 (THOMPSON PATRICK [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 42 - line 50; figure 1A *; | [A]NL1001720C (DEEGE BEHEER B V [NL]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5799820 (MAAS ALAN FRANCIS [US]) [Y] 4-6 * column 2, lines 10-41; figures 1-3 * |