EP1251541 - Motor protection switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göbel, Corell Marktgasse 4 69181 Leimen / DE | 02 /
Niewöhner, Guido Turmgassen-Center 7 69181 Leimen / DE | 03 /
Müller, Ralf Ludwig-Erhardt-Strasse 50 76726 Germersheim / DE | 04 /
Cwetanski, Georgi Hans-Purrmann-Strasse 6b 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Hauk, Jürgen Steinweg 19 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | 06 /
Stamm, Jörg Wistenstrasse 15 8240 Thayngen / CH | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 1140 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 1140 68520 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01109839.9 | 21.04.2001 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251541 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251541 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/02, H01H71/40 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
H01H71/40 (EP);
H01H71/0207 (EP);
H01H71/164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/29] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Motorschutzschalter | [2002/43] | English: | Motor protection switch | [2002/43] | French: | Disjoncteur de protection pour moteurs | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 18.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0501844 (TELEMECANIQUE [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]FR2690561 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1073083 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE29918974U (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |