EP1152447 - Cathode-ray tube cathode and alloy therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A.Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roquais, Jean-Michel THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonso Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Poret, Fabian THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonso Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Le Doze, Régine THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonso Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/45] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01109848.0 | 23.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | FR20000005306 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0005306 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152447 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/142 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H01J1/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/30] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre und zugehörige Legierung | [2001/45] | English: | Cathode-ray tube cathode and alloy therefor | [2001/45] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodique et alliage | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2003 | 30.04.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2004 | 30.04.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2005 | 30.04.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2566115 (BOUNDS ARDREY M) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 18 - line 38 * * column 6, line 57 - line 64 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2837423 (KERSTETTER DONALD R) [X] 1,3,4 * table . *; | [X]US4246682 (DAVIS GEORGE L) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 57 - line 63 * * column 2, line 5 - line 11 * * column 2, line 20 - line 25 * * column 2, line 29 - line 37 * * column 3, line 28 - line 29 *; | [X]EP0847071 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 4 * * column 6, line 32 - line 35 ** column 7, line 42 - line 45 * |