EP1153981 - A compatible blend of polycarbonate with vinyl (co)polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolton, Daniel H. 2923 Broadhead Road Aliquippa, PA 15001 / US | 02 /
Moulinie, Pierre 161 Walden Way Imperial, PA 15126 / US | 03 /
Derikart, David M. 101 Yost Drive Tarentum, PA 15084 / US | 04 /
Kohncke, Nicanor 103 South 22nd Street Pittsburgh, PA 15203 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Klimiuk, Meike, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Klimiuk-Japadita, Meike, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110196.1 | 08.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | US20000568385 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: US 568385 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1153981 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1153981 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153981 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, // (C08L69/00, 25:12, 25:12),(C08L69/00, 33:12, 33:12) | [2001/46] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/46] | Title | German: | Verträgliche Mischung von Polycarbonat mit Vinyl(co)polymer | [2001/46] | English: | A compatible blend of polycarbonate with vinyl (co)polymer | [2001/46] | French: | Mélange compatible de polycarbonate avec de (co)polymère vinylique | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | TR | 15.06.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | PT | 24.11.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01315425 ; | [A]JPH09279004 ; | [DY]US3856886 (SCHNELL H, et al) [DY] 1-10 * examples 17-19,21; claims 3,5,16 * * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 9 *; | [DY]US4874816 (DUJARDIN RALF [DE], et al) [DY] 1-9 * examples 3-6; claim 1 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 7 * * column 8, line 40 - line 63 *; | [Y]EP0530648 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5266635 (WILKEY JOHN D [US]) [A] 1,10 * example 1; claim 1 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 41 *; | JPH0733929 [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [X] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 123:171437/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002185867 [X] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * * IT 24936-68-3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900305), vol. 014, no. 115, Database accession no. (C - 0696), & JP01315425 A 19891220 (TOSOH CORP) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09279004 A 19971028 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |