EP1153896 - Dielectric ceramic composition, method for producing the same and device for communication apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Kenji 3-21-2, Momoyamadai Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0141 / JP | 02 /
Kagata, Hiroshi 15-15-507, Takatsuka-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP | 03 /
Katsumura, Hidenori 5-12-1112, Uozakiminamimachi 5-chome Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0025 / JP | [2006/15] |
Former [2001/46] | 01 /
Harada, Kenji 3-21-2, Momoyadamai Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0141 / JP | ||
02 /
Kagata, Hiroshi 15-15-507, Takatsuka-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP | |||
03 /
Katsumura, Hidenori 5-12-1112, Uozakiminamimachi 5-chome Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0025 / JP | Representative(s) | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110263.9 | 25.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000126520 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126520 | JP20000324525 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000324525 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153896 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153896 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C14/00, C03C8/14 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H01P1/20345 (EP,US);
C03C14/004 (EP,US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,US);
C03C2214/20 (EP,US);
C03C2214/30 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dielektrische Keramikzusammensetzung sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Vorrichtung für Kommunikationsgerät | [2001/46] | English: | Dielectric ceramic composition, method for producing the same and device for communication apparatus using the same | [2001/46] | French: | Composition céramique diélectrique,sa méthode de production et appareil de communication utilisant cette composition | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11228216 ; | [A]JPH03170346 ; | [A]US4777092 (KAWAKAMI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [A]WO8901461 (CERAMICS PROCESS SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 7 * * page 17 - page 18; examples 14,19; table - *; | [A]US5518969 (RAGAN RANDALL C [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - line 41 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 9 * * page 5 - page 7; examples I,IV *; | [A]EP0934910 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0036] *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 44, Database accession no. 1999-522497, XP002172302 & JPH11228216 A 19990824 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911022), vol. 015, no. 413, Database accession no. (C - 0877), & JP03170346 A 19910723 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS62173797 | JPH10101308 | JPH11228216 |