EP1157747 - Removable inline nozzle filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook Country, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolyard, Edward W., Jr. 453 Rembrandt Drive Old Hickory, Tennessee 37138 / US | 02 /
Bourget, Daniel D. 117 Bay Drive Hendersonville, Tennessee 37075 / US | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110396.7 | 27.04.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | US20000576554 | 24.05.2000 Original published format: US 576554 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1157747 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1157747 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157747 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B05C11/10 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B05C5/0279 (EP,US);
B05B15/40 (EP,US);
B05C5/0237 (EP,US);
Y10S239/23 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | B05C5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Abnehmbar Filter für Inline-Düse | [2001/48] | English: | Removable inline nozzle filter | [2001/48] | French: | Filtre interchangeable de buse en ligne | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 19.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB970738 (MERCOL PRODUCTS LTD) [X] 1,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,10-18; | [X]FR2257192 (KODAK PATHE [FR]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19822203 (GRIMM ARNOLD [DE], et al) [X] 1,7-9* the whole document * | Examination | US1710983 |