EP1154078 - Apparatus for and a method of boring the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUER Maschinen GmbH Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | For all designated states Kato Kenki Yugen Kaisha 10-1, Sanpoucho 1-chou Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [2005/40] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states BAUER Maschinen GmbH Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | ||
For all designated states Kato Kenki Yugen Kaisha 10-1, Sanpoucho 1-chou Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Bauer Spezialtiefbau GmbH Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | ||
For all designated states Kato Kenki Yugen Kaisha 10-1, Sanpoucho 1-chou Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Masatoshi, c/o Kato Kenki Yugen Kaisha 10-1, Sanpoucho 2-chou Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Weixler, Leonhard Eichendorffstrasse 6 86672 Thierhaupten / DE | 03 /
Ashida, Shigeki Knappertsbuschstrasse 27 81927 München / DE | 04 /
Fujiki, Daisuke, Kobelco Const. Mach. (Europe) B.V Bolderweg 50 1332 AW Almere / NL | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110402.3 | 27.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000138897 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000138897 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154078 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154078 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154078 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E02D7/20, E02D5/38 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
E02D5/385 (EP,US);
E02D7/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | E02D7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/46] | Extension states | SI | 17.03.2003 | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Methode zum Erdbohren | [2001/46] | English: | Apparatus for and a method of boring the ground | [2001/46] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de forage du sol | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.10.2005 | FI | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | GR | 05.01.2006 | ES | 16.01.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | LU | 27.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
LU | 27.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 05.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6319328 ; | [A]JPS6168924 ; | [XA]US4202416 (BLASCHKE KURT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 44; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,7,10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880624), vol. 012, no. 222, Database accession no. (M - 712), & JP63019328 A 19880127 (NISSHIN KISO KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-3,7,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860816), vol. 010, no. 238, Database accession no. (M - 508), & JP61068924 A 19860409 (TOKAI CONCRETE KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |