EP1149535 - Green tea composition and molding matter thereof, and process for producing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jinseido Company, Limited 2237, Oya Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2005/47] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Jinseido Company, Limited 2237, Oya Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omura, Teijiro, c/o Jinseido Company, Limited 2237, Oya Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110405.6 | 27.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000126938 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126938 | JP20000126941 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126941 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149535 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1149535 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149535 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23F3/14, A23F3/32 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
A23F3/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | A23F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/44] | Title | German: | Produkt aus grünem Tee, dessen Formmaterial sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2001/44] | English: | Green tea composition and molding matter thereof, and process for producing them | [2001/44] | French: | Composition à base de thé vert, son produit de moulage et procédé de préparation | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 13.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/45] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10210932 ; | [A]JPH11139981 ; | [A]CN1105525 ; | [XA]EP0951839 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-8 * examples B-7; claim 1 * [A] 9,13; | [X]EP0983727 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 15; claim 1 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10210932 A 19980811 (AKIYAMA SATORU) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 31, Database accession no. 1999-367012, XP002206953 & JPH11139981 A 19990525 (HANDA K) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 30, Database accession no. 1997-320412, XP002206745 & CN1105525 A 19950726 (DALIAN SEAWEED HEALTH-CARE FOOD FACTORY) [A] 1,9,13 * abstract * |