EP1155788 - Control system of a machine for press cutting sheet material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicole, Marc Chemin Mont-Robert 5 1020 Renens / CH | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2001/47] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 01110562.4 | 30.04.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | CH20000000962 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: CH 9622000 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1155788 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1155788 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155788 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00, G05B19/418 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B26F1/40 (EP,US);
B26D5/20 (KR);
B26D5/00 (EP,US);
Y10T83/162 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | B26D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/50] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System zur Steuerung einer Schneidpresse für blattförmige Materialien | [2001/47] | English: | Control system of a machine for press cutting sheet material | [2001/47] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'une machine de découpage d'ébauches dans un matériau en feuilles | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IE | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | DE | 24.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | LU | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CY | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
LU | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SE | 23.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0537352 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0600672 (APIC YAMADA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0927600 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [PA]DE19944581 (WOSCHNIK & PARTNER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document * |