EP1152174 - Combined detent and neutral sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockelbank, David 293 Lancaster Road Morecambe, Lancaster LA4 5TP / GB | 02 /
Jackson, Graeme Andrew 42 Moreton Drive Leigh, Lancaster WN7 3NF / GB | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110714.1 | 03.05.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | GB20000010778 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0010778 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152174 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152174 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/38 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
F16H59/70 (EP,US);
F16H63/38 (EP,US);
F16H2059/6823 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/07] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kombination eines Rastmechanismus mit Messfühler für die Leerlaufstellung eines Getriebes | [2001/45] | English: | Combined detent and neutral sensor | [2001/45] | French: | Combinaison de mécanisme de détente et capteur pour le point mort d'une transmission | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5717180 (SCHWARZBICH JOERG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE718615 (FIAT SOCIETA AONONIMA) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3315221 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * page 11, line 12 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4103465 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 3 * | by applicant | US5737969 | US5743143 | US4974468 | US5281902 | US4920815 | US5481170 | US5471893 | US5758543 |