EP1153551 - Helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOEI CO., LTD. 8-5, Ueno 5-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Shoei Co., Ltd. 8-5, Ueno 5-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shida, Masayuki Shoei Co., Ltd., 8-5, Ueno 5-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110720.8 | 03.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000135776 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000135776 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1153551 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1153551 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153551 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/28 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
A42B3/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2002/32] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Helm | [2001/46] | English: | Helmet | [2001/46] | French: | Casque | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 22.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2198925 (SHOEI KAKO KK); | [A]EP0474941 (SHOEI KAKO KK [JP]) |