EP1154486 - ESD protection device comprising parallel bipolar transistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czech, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Kappler Strasse 50f 79117 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Graf, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Antoniterstrasse 5 79331 Teuingen-Nimburg / DE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111009.5 | 08.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE20001022366 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022366 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154486 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154486 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H01L27/0259 (EP,US);
H01L27/0266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/08] |
Former [2002/31] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ESD-Schutzstruktur mit parallelen Bipolartransitoren | [2015/14] | English: | ESD protection device comprising parallel bipolar transistors | [2001/46] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre les décharges électrostatiques comprenant des transistors bipolaires paralleles | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/46] | ESD-Schutzstruktur mit parallelen Bipolartransistoren | Examination procedure | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 15.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | [2016/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0575062 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [XA]EP0851494 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9-12 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 32; figures 2A,2B,3 *[A] 2-8; | [A]US5898206 (YAMAMOTO YUHIDE [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 32; figures 17A,17B * * column 3, line 39 - line 48; figures 18,19 *; | [X]EP0948051 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0023]; figures 6A,6B * * paragraph [0026]; figures 8A,8B * * figure 12A * |