EP1256645 - Flat knitting machine having at least a needle bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohr, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Lembergweg 3 72116 Mössingen / DE | 02 /
Diebold, Armin Beim Hofgarten 3 72393 Burladingen / DE | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela, et al Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111016.0 | 08.05.2001 | [2002/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256645 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256645 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/10 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
D04B15/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2004/02] |
Former [2003/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens einem Führungsbett | [2002/46] | English: | Flat knitting machine having at least a needle bed | [2002/46] | French: | Métier à tricoter rectiligne comprenant au moins une fonture | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 05.09.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.10.2003 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2003 | 21.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2003 | 21.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.11.2003 | 21.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1176276 (APPLIC MECANIQUES SOC ET) [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 1, paragraph 17; figures 1,4,5 * * page 2, paragraph 4; figure 4 *; | [XY]CH345099 (HELMUS BATOR JULIANA [NL]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 1, lines 33-37; figure 1 * * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 2 *[Y] 8; | [XY]CH501753 (COURTAULDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3,14 * * column 11, lines 59-63; figure 13A; claim 7 * * column 14, lines 14-20 * [Y] 8; | [X]DE3931414 (SCHIEBER UNIVERSAL MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, lines 44-63; figures 1-4; claims 1-3 * * column 6, lines 23-48 *; | [X]WO9104363 (RUZIO SABAN GJOKO [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 6, lines 1-10; figures 1-3; claim 1 * * page 9, lines 4-10 * * page 7, lines 5-13; figures 3,5 * |