EP1155739 - Column packing and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagaoka, Tadayoshi 573-2, Oaza Ureshi Tondabayashi-shi Osaka-fu / JP | For all designated states Manteufel, Rolf P.C. Hans-Seibold-Strasse 3 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Nagaoka, Tadayoshi 573-2, Oaza Ureshi Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states Manteufel, Rolf P.C. Hans-Seibold-Strasse 3 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaoka, Tadayoshi 573-2, Oaza Ureshi Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Manteufel, Rolf P.C. Hans-Seibold-Strasse 3 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111031.9 | 08.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000147817 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000147817 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1155739 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1155739 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/32 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B01J19/32 (EP,KR,US);
B01J10/00 (KR);
B01J12/00 (KR);
B01J2219/3221 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32282 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32286 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32408 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32483 (EP,US);
B01J2219/328 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kolonnenpackung sowie Verfahren zu ihre Herstellung | [2001/47] | English: | Column packing and method for manufacturing the same | [2001/47] | French: | Garnissage pour colonne et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2405594 (MELVILL FRANCIS L) [X] 1-28 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 33; figures 9-11 *; | [X]GB607288 (FRANCIS LEOPOLD MELVILLE) [X] 1-28 * page 5, line 94 - page 6, line 12; figures 9-11 *; | [A]GB607283 (FRANCIS LEOPOLD MELVILL) [A] 1-28* page 1, line 10 - line 27; figure 4 *; | [PX]EP1033168 (NAGAOKA TADAYOSHI [JP]) [PX] 1-28 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1050352 (NAGAOKA TADAYOSHI [JP]) [PX] 1-28 * abstract * |