EP1154270 - Glycated hemoglobin analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [2015/04] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagishi, Shigeo 9-8-105, Tamagawagakuen 8-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshikawa, Kazuhide 37-6, Hirobakama 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsuno, Takanori 3-7-1003, Shimizu 1-chome Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [2015/04] |
Former [2014/46] | 01 /
Yamagishi, Shigeo 37-17-503, Sagamiohno 7-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshikawa, Kazuhide 25-6-402, Mita 1-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kawagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Matsuno, Takanori 1571-8, Oaza shimokami Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | |||
Former [2001/46] | 01 /
Yamagishi, Shigeo 37-17-503, Sagamiohno 7-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshikawa, Kazuhide 25-6-402, Mita 1-chome, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kawagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Matsuno, Takanori 1571-8, Oaza shimokami Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2015/04] |
Former [2001/46] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole, et al Novapat International S.A. 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 01111098.8 | 09.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | JP20000142263 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000142263 | JP20000142264 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000142264 | JP20000142265 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000142265 | JP20000142266 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000142266 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154270 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154270 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154270 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/24, G01N33/72, G01N1/38 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G01N30/20 (EP);
G01N2030/8822 (EP);
G01N33/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G01N30/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/03] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Analysator zur Messung von glykolisiertem Hämoglobin | [2001/46] | English: | Glycated hemoglobin analyzer | [2001/46] | French: | Analyseur d'hémoglobine glucosée | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/46] | Analyseur d'hemoglobine glucosée | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09274029 ; | [Y]EP0299419 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1,4-6 * page 3, lines 18-21 * * page 4, line 36 - page 7, line 6; table 1 *; | [Y]US4954253 (ALEXANDROV MAXIM L [SU], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, lines 41-58 *; | [Y]EP0577033 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 3, lines 41-44; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0800073 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 5, lines 31-55; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0973039 (BAYER AG [US]) [Y] 7-10 * column 20, lines 39-57 *; | [PX]WO0123879 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2; | EP1219962 [ ] (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [ ] * column 6, line 49 - column 11, line 28; figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09274029 A 19971021 (TOSOH CORP) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |