EP1168302 - Speech recognition system with active standby mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberschachtsiek, André 1392 Borregas Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089-1004 / US | 02 /
Crull, Torsten Zimmerstrasse 18 38106 Braunschweig / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111229.9 | 15.05.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000130369 | 21.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030369 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168302 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168302 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168302 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/20] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spracherkennungssytem mit einem aktiven Bereitschaftszustand | [2002/01] | English: | Speech recognition system with active standby mode | [2002/01] | French: | Système de reconnaissance de parole avec mode de veille active | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.08.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | [2011/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0847003 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,3* page 3, column 4, line 35 - page 4, column 5, line 5 *; | [A]WO0026901 (DRAGON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * claims 1-4,12 *; | [XP]EP1091346 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [XP] 1,3 * page 3, column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 2 * * page 3, column 4, line 57 - page 4, column 5, line 39 * * figure 11; claims 1,2,20 * |