EP1163943 - Membrane plate for filter presses, supporting plate and membrane for such a membrane plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klinkau GmbH + Co. Raiffeisenstrasse 6 87616 Marktoberdorf (Leuterschach) / DE | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Johann Kirchberg 3a 87647 Oberthingau / DE | 02 /
Seib, Kurt Carl-Orff-Ring 113 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | 03 /
Stanik, Reimund Bischof-Ketteler-Strasse 10 87616 Marktoberdorf / DE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111354.5 | 09.05.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | DE2000124725 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024725 | [2001/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163943 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163943 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/21 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
B01D25/215 (EP);
B01D25/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/37] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Membranfilterplatte für eine Filterpresse sowie Trägerplatte und Membran für eine solche Membranfilterplatte | [2001/51] | English: | Membrane plate for filter presses, supporting plate and membrane for such a membrane plate | [2001/51] | French: | Plateau à membrane pour presses à filtrer, plaque de support et membrane pour ledit plateau à membrane | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4325235 (JUNKER FILTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,21,22 * column 4, line 8 - line 24; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4119166 (LENSER KUNSTSTOFF PRESS [DE]) [A] 21 * figure 3C *; | [A]DE4415274 (JV KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [A] * column 2, line 29 - line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9216298U (RITTERSHAUS & BLECHER) [A] * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 7; figure 3 * |