EP1256556 - Porcelain enamel composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferro France S.A.R.L. 43, rue Jeanne d'Arc 52115 Saint Dizier Cedex / FR | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckmann, Jean-Christophe 6 Place Emile Zola 52100 Saint-Dizier / FR | 02 /
Oumoumeme, Moha Ait Ali Apt. 76- immeuble Antilles, 10, rue Louis Jouvet 52100 Saint Dizier / FR | 03 /
Roques, Francois 23, rue du 11 Novembre 1918 51300 Vitry le Francois / FR | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Markus, et al Reinhardt & Söllner Patentanwälte Hausen 5b 85551 Kirchheim b. München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Reinhardt, Markus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Reinhardt Söllner Ganahl, Hausen 5b 85551 Kirchheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111365.1 | 09.05.2001 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256556 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/02 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
C03C8/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Porzellan-Emailzusammensetzung | [2002/46] | English: | Porcelain enamel composition | [2002/46] | French: | Composition d'émail vitrifié | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4361654 (OHMURA AKIRA, et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 27 - column 4, line 20; example - *; | [A]EP0402007 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [A]US5976999 (EVANS PHILIP ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0509792 (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [A]PL157992B (RYBNICKIE ZAKLADY WYROBOW META [PL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5382552 |