EP1162051 - Methods and apparatus for producing foamed thermoplastics articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsner, Peter Amselstrasse 8 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
Krause, Wenzel Am Sixenrain 5 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Troster, Stefan Nebeniusstrasse 35 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
Henning, Frank Eschenweg 5 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 05 /
Radtke, Andreas Pfinztalstrasse 96 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 06 /
Walch, Michael Untere Dorfstrasse 21 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/50] | Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111386.7 | 10.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | DE20001028237 | 07.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10028237 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162051 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162051 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162051 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34, B29C44/58 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B29C44/3446 (EP);
B29C44/0415 (EP);
B29C44/3453 (EP);
B29C44/348 (EP);
B29C44/586 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | B29C44/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/33] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von geschäumten thermoplastischen Formteilen | [2006/07] | English: | Methods and apparatus for producing foamed thermoplastics articles | [2001/50] | French: | Procédés et dispositif pour la production d'articles thermoplastiques expansés | [2006/07] |
Former [2001/50] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von geschäumten thermoplastischen Formteilung | ||
Former [2001/50] | Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'articles thermoplastiques expansés | Examination procedure | 04.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.08.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | GB | 02.08.2006 | |
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | GB | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0376064 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0610953 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 13, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]US3619438 (CISTONE DAVID R) [A] 5-8,13,18-20,30 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000025057 ; | [A]EP0809257 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000025057 A 20000125 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * abstract * |