EP1162011 - Apparatus for flanging a border of a piece by rollfolding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amon, Henry Keidäckerstrasse 2 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | 02 /
Wüstholz, Paul Mörikestrasse 4 74223 Flein / DE | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG Patentabteilung I/ET-3 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG, Patentabteilung I/ET-3 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111490.7 | 11.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | DE2000128706 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10028706 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162011 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162011 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162011 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/02 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
B21D39/021 (EP);
B21D39/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2004/15] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Umlegen einer Bördelkante eines Werkstücks durch Rollfalzen | [2001/50] | English: | Apparatus for flanging a border of a piece by rollfolding | [2001/50] | French: | Appareil pour plier le bord d'une pièce par repliage à rouleaux | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 08.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH08164433 ; | [A]JPH07290158 ; | [Y]US5267387 (SAWA MASAZUMI [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 27; figures 4-7 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08164433 A 19960625 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 5,6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07290158 A 19951107 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |