EP1175071 - Method for searching of data in at least two databases and database system with at least two databases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MobileMedia Ideas LLC 5425 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 801 Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | [2010/32] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Josenhans, Michael Danziger Strasse 9 25474 Ellerbeck / DE | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Walke, Christoph Martin, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Walke, Christoph Martin, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/28] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111549.0 | 11.05.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000127523 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10027523 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175071 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175071 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175071 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04M1/2745 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04M1/2747 (EP,US);
H04M1/2748 (EP,US);
G06F16/248 (US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M2250/14 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/08] | G06F17/30 | ||
Former IPC [2002/04] | H04M1/2745 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Suchen von Daten in zumindest zwei Datenbanken und Datenbanksystem mit zumindest zwei Datenbanken | [2002/04] | English: | Method for searching of data in at least two databases and database system with at least two databases | [2002/04] | French: | Procédé pour rechercher des données dans au moins deux bases de données et système de base de données avec au moins deux bases de données | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/06] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
SE | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4453217 (BOIVIE RICHARD H [US]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 27 - line 40 * * column 12, line 21 - line 57 * * column 13, line 54 - line 57 *; | [X]EP0295876 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - line 34 * * page 7, line 12 - line 32 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 58 * * page 12, line 31 - line 37 * * page 17, line 47 - page 23, line 43 * * figures 2,10,18,19,21-44; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5659732 (KIRSCH STEVEN T [US]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - line 49 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5903632 (BRANDON DONALD [CA]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]WO9955058 (SYNERGETICS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 14 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 2 * * page 17, line 32 - page 19, line 6 * * page 23, line 7 - line 34 * * page 43, line 7 - line 19 * * claims 116,135 *; | [A]DE19928666 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 10 ** column 4, line 5 - line 66 * |