EP1164556 - Opto-electronic intruder alarm apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Sick AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wüstefeld, Martin Siedlungsweg 14 79350 Sexau / DE | 02 /
Plasberg, Georg, Dr. Wuhrmatten 24 79353 Bahlingen / DE | 03 /
Jürs, Heiner Breslauer Weg 8 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 04 /
Mutter, Gerhard Mutterslehen 2 79837 Ibach / DE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/51] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111715.7 | 14.05.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | DE20001026305 | 26.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026305 | [2001/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164556 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164556 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164556 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/183, G01S17/02, F16P3/14, G01V8/20 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US);
F16P3/142 (EP,US);
F16P3/144 (EP,US);
G06V10/145 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/51] | G08B13/183, G01S17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Title | German: | Optoelektronische Eindringalarm-Vorrichtung | [2001/51] | English: | Opto-electronic intruder alarm apparatus | [2001/51] | French: | Appareil d'alarme d'intrusion optoélectronique | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 14.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2006
03.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Leuze lumiflex GmbH + Co. KG Liebigstrasse 4 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | 02
25.04.2006
04.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Duhme, Torsten Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2006
03.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Leuze lumiflex GmbH + Co. KG Liebigstrasse 4 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE Opponent's representative Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | ||
02
25.04.2006
04.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Pilz GmbH & Co. KG Felix-Wankel-Str.2 73760 Ostfildern / DE Opponent's representative Duhme, Torsten Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | 08.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 04.06.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/44] | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 29.03.2010 | Appeal received No. T0367/10 | 01.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.06.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 18.02.2010 | Appeal received No. T0367/10 | 14.05.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.06.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 04.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.07.2005 | CY | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | IE | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | TR | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | AT | 14.05.2006 | LU | 14.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | ES | 15.05.2011 | NL | 01.12.2011 | IT | 14.05.2013 | [2015/08] |
Former [2014/11] | CY | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
AT | 14.05.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 15.05.2011 | ||
NL | 01.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
AT | 14.05.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
ES | 15.05.2011 | ||
NL | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2009/02] | CY | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
AT | 14.05.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
AT | 14.05.2006 | ||
LU | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
AT | 14.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
SE | 27.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4424537 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE29602098U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 3 - line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US5963253 (DWYER DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 22; figure 2b *; | [A]DE29920715U (LEUZE LUMIFLEX GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 37 * * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 13 * |