EP1179371 - Pretreatment installation for the pretreatment by spraying [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merkenschlager, Thomas Bucherstrasse 46 D-90408 Nürnberg / DE | [2002/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111734.8 | 15.05.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | DE2000133616 | 11.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10033616 | [2002/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1179371 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1179371 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179371 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12, B05B1/14 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B05B1/14 (EP);
B05B16/20 (EP);
B05B16/40 (EP);
B05B16/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/07] | B05B15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Vorbehandlungsanlage zur Sprüh-Vorbehandlung | [2002/07] | English: | Pretreatment installation for the pretreatment by spraying | [2002/07] | French: | Installation de prétraitement pour le prétraitement par pulvérisation | [2002/07] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | IE | 14.01.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | LU | 15.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 15.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 15.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1901121 (BURGER KG HORST) [Y] 1 * page 13; figures 2,3 * [A] 2,4,5; | [DA]EP0505694 (MERKENSCHLAGER THOMAS [DE]) [DA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [DYA]DE29717515U (MERKENSCHLAGER THOMAS DIPL ING [DE]) [DY] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figure 1 * [A] 2,4,5 | by applicant | EP0505694 | DE29717515U |