EP1164546 - Method and apparatus for signal segmentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maetschke, Stefan Muehlerlenweg 3 90518 Unterrieden / DE | [2001/51] | Application number, filing date | 01111783.5 | 15.05.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | US20000572024 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: US 572024 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164546 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164546 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G06T7/168 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/194 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/34] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildsegmentationsverfahren und -Vorrichtung | [2001/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for signal segmentation | [2001/51] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la segmentation d'images | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5003616 (ORITA MIYAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4307956 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9624114 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 19, line 14 *; | [X] - WESZKA J S, "A SURVEY OF THRESHOLD SELECTION TECHNIQUES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, ACADEMIC PRESS. NEW YORK, US, (197804), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 259 - 265, XP001149105 [X] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0146-664X(78)90116-8 | [X] - WESZKA J S ET AL, "A threshold selection technique", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS USA, (197412), vol. C-23, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 1322 - 1326, XP009074188 [X] 1-30 * the whole document * | [PA] - VALAPARLA D P ET AL, "An adaptive technique for the extraction of object region and boundary from images with complex environment", APPLIED IMAGERY PATTERN RECOGNITION WORKSHOP, AIPR 2001 30TH WASHINGTON, DC, USA 10-12 OCT. 2001, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20011010), ISBN 0-7695-1245-3, pages 194 - 199, XP010584364 [PA] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AIPR.2001.991226 |