EP1197763 - Air traffic control support system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooga, Yasuisa c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01111946.8 | 18.05.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | JP20000310240 | 11.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000310240 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197763 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197763 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/95, G01S17/95, G01S13/91 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G01S13/95 (EP,US);
G01S13/91 (EP,US);
G01S17/58 (EP,US);
G01S17/95 (EP,US);
G01S7/04 (EP,US);
G01S13/913 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/16] | G01S13/95, G01S13/91 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luftverkehrsüberwachungunterstützungssystem | [2002/16] | English: | Air traffic control support system | [2002/16] | French: | Système d'appui pour le contrôle du trafic aérien | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2007 | 26.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3735333 (BALSER M, et al) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 10 - line 20; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 11 - line 26 * * column 5, line 17 - line 19 *; | [Y]US5657009 (GORDON ANDREW A [US]) [Y] 6,7 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 52 *; | [Y]US5845874 (BEASLEY GRAHAM D [US]) [Y] 8,9 * column 4, line 37 - line 47 * * column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 4 * * column 8, line 54 - line 63 *; | [X]GB2327517 (DIRECTOR GENERAL SHIP RESEARCH [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 14, line 26 - page 16, line 23 * * page 25, line 14 - page 30, line 6; tables 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0002064 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [Y] 6,7 * page 6, line 10 - line 16 *; | [XY] - HINTON D A ET AL, "Development of a wake vortex spacing system for airport capacity enhancement and delay reduction", NASA, (20001007), vol. 1, pages 3E61 - 3E610, XP010525365 [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-9 | [A] - WAGENER T J ET AL, "2 /spl mu/m LIDAR for laser-based remote sensing: flight demonstration and application survey", DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 1994. 13TH DASC., AIAA/IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 30 OCT.-3 NOV. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941030), ISBN 0-7803-2425-0, pages 574 - 579, XP010127076 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 578, column R, line 3 - line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DASC.1994.369420 | [Y] - HEINRICHS R M ET AL, "Measurements of aircraft wake vortices at Memphis International Airport with a CW CO2 coherent laser radar", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (19960410), vol. 2737, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 122 - 133, XP009038267 [Y] 9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.241060 | Examination | - HINTON D.A., "An aircraft vortex spacing system (AVOSS) for dynamical wake vortex spacing criteria", AGARD 78TH FLUID DYNAMICS PANEL MEETING AND SYMPOSIUM ON THE CHARACTERISATION & MODIFICATION OF WAKES FROM LIFTINNG VEHICLES IN FLUIDS, TRONDHEIM, NORWAY, LANGLEY, USA, (19960520), pages 23-1 - 23-11 | - HINTON D.A., "Design of an Aircraft Vortex Spacing System for Airport Capacity Improvement", AIAA 2000-0622 38TH AEROSPACE SCIENCES MEETING & EXHIBIT, RENO NV, RENO, NV, (20000110), pages 1 - 18 |