EP1160131 - Connection device for fixing bars to a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABBRI S.r.l. Via Ospitaletto, 29/31 I-25040 Bornato Cazzago S. Martino (Brescia) / IT | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabbri Corsarini, Luciano Via Bellavista 3 25017 Sedena di Lonato (Prov. Brescia) / IT | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01112032.6 | 23.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI01244 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: IT MI001244 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160131 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160131 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/058 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2002 | LT | 23.05.2002 | LV | 23.05.2002 | MK | 23.05.2002 | RO | 23.05.2002 | SI | 23.05.2002 | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für Befestigungsstangen an einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2001/49] | English: | Connection device for fixing bars to a motor vehicle | [2001/49] | French: | Dispositif de connection des rails latéraux pour un véhicule | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | CY | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | TR | 07.04.2004 | LU | 23.05.2004 | IE | 24.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
CY | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
TR | 07.04.2004 | ||
LU | 23.05.2004 | ||
IE | 24.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
TR | 07.04.2004 | ||
LU | 23.05.2004 | ||
IE | 24.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
LU | 23.05.2004 | ||
IE | 24.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LU | 23.05.2004 | ||
IE | 24.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LU | 23.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9002668 (J S PRODUCTS AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9* page 2, line 7 - page 4, line 10; figure 4 *; | [X]DE9002387U (HAGUS C. LUCHTENBERG GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-4,6,9 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 14; figure 2 *; | [X]US5306156 (GIBBS ANDREW H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9 * column 8, line 36 - line 63; figure 14 *; | [X]FR2705295 (FABI AUTOMOBILE SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 6; figure 2 * |