EP1179410 - Method for measuring the welding voltage in a heating coil of a heating coil fitting and heating coil welding apparatus therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PF Schweisstechnologie GmbH Karl-Bröger-Strasse 10 36304 Alsfeld / DE | [2003/27] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states PF Schweisstechnologie GmbH Fulder Tor 30 36304 Alsfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spychalski-Merle, Achim Fulder Tor 30 36304 Alsfeld / DE | 02 /
Merle, Bernd Ringstrasse 4 36304 Alsfeld / DE | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Fritsche, Rainer, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Fritsche, Rainer, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/07] | Fritsche, Rainer, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112266.0 | 18.05.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | DE2000139192 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10039192 | [2002/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179410 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179410 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/34, F16L47/02 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
B29C65/342 (EP,US);
B29C65/3468 (EP,US);
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C66/5229 (EP,US);
B29C66/91313 (EP,US);
B29C66/91653 (EP,US);
F16L47/03 (EP,US);
B29C65/3476 (EP,US);
B29C66/94 (EP,US);
G01R19/0084 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen der Schweissspannung an einer Heizwendel eines Heizwendelfittings sowie Heizwendel-Schweissvorrichtung hierfür | [2002/07] | English: | Method for measuring the welding voltage in a heating coil of a heating coil fitting and heating coil welding apparatus therefore | [2002/07] | French: | Procédé pour mesurer la tension de soudage sur un filament chauffant d'un dispositif de soudage et dispositif de soudage à filament chauffant | [2002/07] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.12.2003 | FI | 10.12.2003 | IE | 10.12.2003 | NL | 10.12.2003 | TR | 10.12.2003 | DK | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.03.2004 | PT | 10.05.2004 | AT | 18.05.2004 | LU | 18.05.2004 | BE | 31.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
TR | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
AT | 18.05.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
TR | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
AT | 18.05.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
AT | 18.05.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 10.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH11216777 ; | [Y]JPH0716930 ; | [Y]JPH0552288 ; | [A]JPH0347737 ; | [A]JPH11291355 ; | [A]GB2137026 (FUSION PLASTICS LTD) [A] 3,6,7 * page 1, lines 89-114; figure 4 *; | [A]US4486650 (BRIDGSTOCK ERIC [GB], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, lines 5-13 ** column 4, lines 22-62; figures 1,2 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11216777 A 19990810 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * [Y] 3,6-8 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07016930 A 19950120 (TOKUSHU KOGYO KK) [Y] 3,6,7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930708), vol. 017, no. 362, Database accession no. (M - 1441), & JP05052288 A 19930302 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910516), vol. 015, no. 190, Database accession no. (M - 1113), & JP03047737 A 19910228 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11291355 A 19991026 (KUBOTA CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |