Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9636732 | Global Dossier | 21.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005153454 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US79217604 | 02.03.2004 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | US82832601 | 05.04.2001 | US34155596 | 24.06.1996 | US190804 | 01.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7341874 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2008 | B2 | US2004265944 | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US79217604 | 02.03.2004 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | US82832601 | 05.04.2001 | US34155596 | 24.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11505703 | Global Dossier | 25.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | US9606938 | 14.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07507394 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0883692 | Global Dossier | 12.05.1999 | A4 | EP0883692 | 16.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | US9606938 | 14.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0664884 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1997 | A4 | EP0664884 | 02.08.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU713720B | Global Dossier | 09.12.1999 | B2 | AU5749096 | 29.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | US9606938 | 14.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU685055B | Global Dossier | 15.01.1998 | B2 | AU4395893 | 30.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1130399 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2009 | B1 | EP1130399 | 11.09.2002 | A3 | EP1130399 | 05.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP93914216 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2221727 | 21.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2406356 | 30.01.2007 | C | CA2406356 | 09.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2136717 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990014933 | 25.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6750061 | 15.06.2004 | B2 | US2003059952 | 27.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | US82832601 | 05.04.2001 | US34155596 | 24.06.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5792664 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US44620895 | 19.05.1995 | US47499795 | 07.06.1995 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | US34155594 | 23.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6271037 | 07.08.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9305070 | 27.05.1993 | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | US34155596 | 24.06.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9324834 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE427493T | 15.04.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2136717 | 09.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69334274D1 | 14.05.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US89117792 | 29.05.1992 | Type | Earlier application | EP0664884 |