EP1130399 - Method for the sequence determination of peptides using a mass spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/36] | Method and product for the sequence determination of peptides using a mass spectrometer | ||
[2008/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY 1230 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | [2009/14] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY 1230 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chait, Brian T. 500 East 63rd Street, Apt. 20D New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
Beavis, Ronald 55 Pine Bud Avenue St. John's, Newfoundland A1B 3S7 / CA | 03 /
Wang, Rong 500 East 63rd Street, Apt. 26E New York, NY 10021 / CA | 04 /
Kent, Stephen B.H. 273 Hartford Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / CA | [2001/45] |
Former [2001/36] | 01 /
Chait, Brian T. 500 East 63rd Street, Apt. 20D New York, NY 10021 / US | ||
02 /
Beavis, Ronald 55 Pine Bud Avenue St. John's, Newfoundland A1B 3S7 / CA | |||
03 /
Wang, Rong 500 East 63rd Street, Apt. 26E New York, NY 10021 / CA | |||
04 /
Kent, Stephen B.H. 2766 Costebell Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / CA | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112292.6 | 27.05.1993 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US19920891177 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: US 891177 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130399 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130399 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130399 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C07K1/12, C07K1/107 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/6842 (EP,US);
C07K1/107 (EP,US);
C07K1/128 (EP,US);
G01N33/6824 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | G01N33/68, C07K1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Folge von Peptiden unter Verwendung eines Massenspektrometers | [2008/32] | English: | Method for the sequence determination of peptides using a mass spectrometer | [2008/32] | French: | Méthode pour la détermination de séquences peptidiques à l'aide d'un spectromètre de masse | [2008/32] |
Former [2001/36] | Verfahren und Produkt zur Bestimmung der Folge von Peptiden unter Verwendung eines Massenspektrometers | ||
Former [2001/36] | Method and product for the sequence determination of peptides using a mass spectrometer | ||
Former [2001/36] | Méthode et produit pour la détermination de séquences peptidiques à l'aide d'un spectromètre de masse | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93914216.2 / EP0664884 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.2009 | BE | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | IT | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | ES | 12.07.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 12.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - AEBERSOLD R ET AL, "DESIGN, SYNTHESIS, AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A PROTEIN SEQUENCING REAGENT YIELDING AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES WITH ENHANCED DETECTABILITY BY MASS SPECTROMETRY", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (1992), vol. 1, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 494 - 503, XP000998678 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * | [DA] - SELF R ET AL, "THE COMBINED USE OF ENZYMATIC HYDROLYSIS AND FAST ATOM BOMBARDMENT MASS SPECTROMETRY FOR PEPTIDE SEQUENCING", BIOMEDICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL MASS SPECTROMETRY, WILEY, LONDON, GB, (1983), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0887-6134, pages 78 - 82, XP001009599 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bms.1200100206 | [DA] - BEAVIS R C ET AL, "FACTORS AFFECTING THE ULTRAVIOLET LASER DESORPTION OF PROTEINS", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, HEYDEN, LONDON, GB, (1989), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 233 - 237, XP001009467 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.1290030708 |